blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2739154 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2739154



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 355
02.05.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.05.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
22.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
22.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 40
28.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 31
28.11.2017 Description Search / examination 32
28.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2014 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
22.10.2014 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
15.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
19.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.09.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.03.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
18.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
11.12.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.04.2013 Republication of A1/A2/A3 Pamphlet - corrections, alterations or supplements Search / examination 42
26.02.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 31
07.02.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
07.02.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42