Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2739154


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
03.05.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
25.05.2018 (Expected) grant published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.05.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.12.2017 Change - classification published on  17.01.2018  [2018/03]
15.12.2017 Change - classification published on  17.01.2018  [2018/03]
29.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.08.2017 First examination report
09.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 Change - representative
11.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.10.2014 Supplementary search report published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Change - classification published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Change - classification published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
03.10.2014 Change - extension states published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
23.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
11.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
09.05.2014 Request for examination filed published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
03.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication