Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805033

EP2805033 - IMPROVED CRYOGENIC ENGINE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dearman Engine Company Ltd
Unit5 Stafford Cross Business Park
Stafford Road
Croydon CR0 4TU / GB
[2017/03]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Dearman Engine Company Ltd
1 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7SH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / AYRES, Michael
78 Brockley Grove
London SE4 1RJ / GB
02 / CLARKE, Henry
48a Foxley Road
London SW9 6ES / GB
03 / DEARMAN, Peter
52 Thornbera Road
Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire CM23 3NL / GB
04 / WEN, Dongsheng
24 Azov House
Commodore Street
London E1 4PX / GB
 [2016/27]
Former [2014/48]01 / AYRES, Michael
78 Brockley Grove
London SE4 1RJ / GB
02 / CLARKE, Henry
60 Glengall Road
London NW6 7ER / GB
03 / DEARMAN, Peter
52 Thornbera Road
Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire CM23 3NL / GB
04 / WEN, Dongsheng
24 Azov House
Commodore Street
London E1 4PX / GB
Representative(s)Bingham, Ian Mark
The IP Asset Partnership Limited
Prama House
267 Banbury Road
Oxford OX2 7HT / GB
[2016/27]
Former [2014/48]Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date12820877.420.12.2012
[2016/27]
WO2012GB53220
Priority number, dateGB2011002219122.12.2011         Original published format: GB 201122191
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013093486
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2805033
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805033
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01K25/10, F02M21/02, F02M21/06, F01K25/06
[2016/08]
Former International [2014/48]F01K25/10, F02M21/02, F02M21/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES KRYOGENES MOTORSYSTEM[2014/48]
English:IMPROVED CRYOGENIC ENGINE SYSTEM[2014/48]
French:SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR CRYOGÉNIQUE AMÉLIORÉ[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
30.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2016Fee for grant paid
25.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2016
Opposition(s)07.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.12.2012
AL06.07.2016
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
TR06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
MT20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU20.12.2012
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
TR06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
MT20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU20.12.2012
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
MT20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU20.12.2012
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CY06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
MK06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
IE20.12.2016
LU20.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/45]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT06.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102006061251  (MAN DIESEL SE [DE] MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE [DE]) [X] 1,15,16,30 * paragraphs [0021] - [0035]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2010242921  (HARPER GREGORY [CA]) [X] 1,13,16 * paragraphs [0055] - [0061]; figure 1 *;
 [X]FR2920484  (MAN DIESEL SE [DE]) [X] 1,15,16,30 * page 8, line 10 - page 12, line 19; figure 1 *;
 [XI]US2009320786  (FISHER WILL [AU]) [X] 31,38,39,79,80 * paragraphs [0049] - [0058]; figures 2,3 * [I] 32,34,36,41,43,45,46,48,49,51,52,55,56,58,59,61,62,65,66,68,72,73,75;
 [A]US7047744  (ROBERTSON STUART J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4893471  (HULING DON W [US]) [A] 1-30 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2814530  (COTON JEAN ANDRE JUSTIN [FR]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4178761  (SCHWARTZMAN EVERETT H [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007163261  (STRATHMAN MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6205981  (LORRAINE JACK R [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007051089  (LEWIS STEVEN A [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003136126  (DEARMAN PETER THOMAS [GB]) [A] 31-80 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3710770  (NEWKIRK M ET AL) [A] 31-80 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US2008271455  (KARPF DANIEL J [US]) [AD] 31-80 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4430978  (LEWIS DONALD J [US] ET AL) [A] 31-80 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008276627  (LEE JUNG HAN [KR] ET AL) [A] 31-80 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6983598
 US2008271455