Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2931589

EP2931589 - SADDLE PILLAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Selle S.M.P. S.A.S. Di M. Schiavon
Via A. Einstein 5 Z.I.
35020 Casalserugo / IT
[2015/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHIAVON, Franco
c/o SELLE SMP sas di M. Schiavon
via Einstein
5 Z.I.
I-35020 Casalserugo (PD) / IT
02 / SCHIAVON, Maurizio
c/o SELLE SMP sas di M. Schiavon
via Einstein
5 Z.I.
I-35020 Casalserugo (PD) / IT
 [2015/43]
Representative(s)Vinci, Marcello
Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116
35141 Padova / IT
[2015/43]
Application number, filing date12820933.519.12.2012
[2015/43]
WO2012IB57459
Priority number, dateIT2012PD0038417.12.2012         Original published format: IT PD20120384
[2015/43]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014096903
Date:26.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2931589
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B62J1/08, B23P11/02
[2015/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
TitleGerman:SATTELSTANGE[2015/43]
English:SADDLE PILLAR[2015/43]
French:TIGE DE SELLE[2015/43]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2015National basic fee paid 
02.07.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
09.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]US3476496  (GOLDEN HARRY) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 61 - line 65; figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 6 - line 9 * * column 3, line 39 - line 46 *;
 [I]US2010066134  (GOERING THOMAS [DE]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE4420772  (LEIBFRIED DIETER DR ING [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 20 - line 25; figure 1 * * column 2, line 10 - line 13 *;
 [A]GB2455565  (2H OFFSHORE ENGINEERING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 26 - line 28; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPS6075188U  (UNKNOWN) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US2011241389  (TSAI AN-TING [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 2,7 *
by applicantUS2011241389
 US2010066134