Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798924

EP2798924 - FAILURE PROTECTION FOR A POWER DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2018/50]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOLFF, Jeffrey, John
2901 East Lake Road
Lawrence Park, PA 16531 / US
02 / KUTTENKULER, Jason, Daniel
2901 East Lake Road
Lawrence Park, PA 16531 / US
03 / MARI CURBELO, Alvaro, Jorge
Freisinger Landstrasse 50
85748 Garching b. Munchen / DE
04 / YOUNG, Henry, Todd
2901 East Lake Road
Lawrence Park, PA 16531 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12821001.027.12.2012
[2018/50]
WO2012US71782
Priority number, dateUS201161582000P30.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161582000 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013101910
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798924
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798924
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/03, H02G5/06, H05K7/14, H02M7/00
[2018/32]
Former International [2014/45]H05K7/14, H02M7/00, H01L23/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSFALLSCHUTZ FÜR EIN KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM[2014/45]
English:FAILURE PROTECTION FOR A POWER DELIVERY SYSTEM[2014/45]
French:PROTECTION CONTRE LA DÉFAILLANCE POUR SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE D'ÉNERGIE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
02.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2018Fee for grant paid
26.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2015
Opposition(s)13.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.12.2018
AT12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU27.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/45]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
MC12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU27.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
LU27.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/24]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US2009250799  (BILLMANN MARKUS [DE] ET AL) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] * * paragraph [0027] *;
 [I]DE202006004221U  (ABB OY HELSINKI [FI]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] *;
 [XI]US6160696  (BAILEY RONALD BARRY [US] ET AL) [X] 13,17-19,21 * abstract * * figures 10-11 * * column 1, lines 5-24 * * column 5, lines 14-33 * [I] 14-16,20