Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795309

EP2795309 - A METHOD FOR CALIBRATING AN ON-LINE CONTROL OF A MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR A MULTICOMPONENT SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/44]A METHOD FOR ON-LINE CONTROL OF A MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR A MULTICOMPONENT SHEET MATERIAL
[2016/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hexcel Composites Limited
Ickleton Road
Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QD / GB
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / ELLIS, John
Hexcel Composites Limited
5 Petersfield Road
Duxford Cambridgeshire CB22 4SF / GB
02 / CABALLERO, Andrea
Hexcel Composites Limited
Ikcleton Road
Duxford Cambridgeshire CB22 4QD / GB
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Pols, Ronald Maarten
Hexcel Composites Limited
Ickleton Road
Duxford, Cambridge CB22 4QB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Pols, Ronald Maarten
Hexcel Composites Limited
LAW
Ickleton Road
Duxford
Cambridge CB22 4QD / GB
Application number, filing date12821018.421.12.2012
[2016/25]
WO2012EP76791
Priority number, dateGB2011002232923.12.2011         Original published format: GB 201122329
GB2012000760901.05.2012         Original published format: GB 201207609
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093071
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795309
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795309
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/04, G01N33/44, G05B19/418, G01N29/44
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG EINER ONLINE-STEUERUNG EINES VERFAHRENS ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRKOMPONENTIGEN BLATTMATERIALS[2016/07]
English:A METHOD FOR CALIBRATING AN ON-LINE CONTROL OF A MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR A MULTICOMPONENT SHEET MATERIAL[2016/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CALIBRATION DE LA RÉGULATION EN PRODUCTION D'UN PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU EN FEUILLE MULTICOMPOSANT[2016/07]
Former [2014/44]VERFAHREN ZUR ONLINE-STEUERUNG EINES VERFAHRENS ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRKOMPONENTIGEN BLATTMATERIALS
Former [2014/44]A METHOD FOR ON-LINE CONTROL OF A MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR A MULTICOMPONENT SHEET MATERIAL
Former [2014/44]PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION EN PRODUCTION D'UN PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU EN FEUILLE MULTICOMPOSANT
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.01.2016
12.01.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2016Fee for grant paid
04.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16168130.9  / EP3067690
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2015
Opposition(s)23.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.12.2012
AL22.06.2016
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
TR22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU21.12.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
TR22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU21.12.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
MT21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/38]HU21.12.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU21.12.2012
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CY22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
MK22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/49]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
IE21.12.2016
LU21.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
Former [2017/45]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011135872  (MAY ANDRZEJ MICHAL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,11,13-17,21,22 * the whole document * [I] 3,8-10,12,18,19,23-25;
 [X]EP1046666  (HEXCEL CORP [US]) [X] 18,19,24,25 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0009] - [0040]; figure 2 *;
 [XAI]US2008315462  (BATZINGER THOMAS JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,3 * [A] 3,5,7,11,23 [I] 8-10,12-17,21,22;
 [XAI]US3960650  (PARKS DEWEY P, et al) [X] 1,4-8,18,19,24,25 * column 2, line 55 - column 6, line 36; figure 1 * [A] 20-23 [I] 3,11-17;
 [A]US5170367  (MACKAY KIRK R [US], et al) [A] 20 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 62; figures 1,9 *
ExaminationUS5266139
by applicantUS2010065760
    - SRIDHAR RANGANATHAN; SURESH G. ADVANI; MARK A. LAMONTIA, "A Non-Isothermal Process Model for Consolidation and Void Reduction during In-Situ Tow Placement of Thermoplastic Composites", JOURNAL OF COMPOSITE MATERIALS, (1995), vol. 29, pages 1040 - 1062
    - YERRAMALLI, C. S.; WAAS, A. M., "A nondimensional number to classify composite compressive failure", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MECHANICS, TRANSACTIONS ASME, (2004), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 402 - 408
    - YERRAMALLI, C. S.; WAAS, A. M., "A failure criterion for fibre reinforced polymer composites under combined compression-torsion loading", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SOLIDS AND STRUCTURES, (2003), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 1139 - 1164