Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2795309 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2795309



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 287
26.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.05.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.05.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
15.02.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 21
05.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
06.01.2016 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.01.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.01.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
15.09.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.09.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.09.2015 Annex to a communication Search / examination 12
02.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
02.09.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.08.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
15.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.03.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.03.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
27.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
06.05.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
27.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
03.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.05.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
21.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
21.12.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
21.12.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
21.12.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 17
21.12.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3