Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2795309


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
28.04.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
20.05.2016 (Expected) grant published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
12.05.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.05.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.05.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
14.02.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.01.2016 Change - German title published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - English title published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.01.2016 Change - French title published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
06.01.2016 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
14.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.07.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.04.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.03.2015 First examination report
27.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
06.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
26.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2013 PCT data prior to European publication