Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795689

EP2795689 - CONTROLLABLE POLYMER ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/34]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / WAGEMANS, Wiebe
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / BROKKEN, Dirk
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / CROMPVOETS, Floris, Maria, Hermansz
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/32]
Former [2014/44]01 / WAGEMANS, Wiebe
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / BROKKEN, Dirk
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / CROMPVOETS, Floris, Maria, Hermansz
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/28]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Philips Lighting B.V.
Philips Lighting Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2014/44]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date12821189.318.12.2012
[2017/28]
WO2012IB57412
Priority number, dateUS201161578426P21.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161578426 P
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093766
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795689
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795689
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/193, H01L41/45, G02B26/08, H01L41/09
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERBARER POLYMERAKTUATOR[2014/44]
English:CONTROLLABLE POLYMER ACTUATOR[2014/44]
French:ACTIONNEUR POLYMÈRE CONTRÔLABLE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
23.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2017Fee for grant paid
02.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2017
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.12.2012
AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
IE18.12.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
LU18.12.2017
MT18.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SI12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
IT12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
EE12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RO12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
SK12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.07.2017
CZ12.07.2017
DK12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
LV12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.07.2017
ES12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
PL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
BG12.10.2017
NO12.10.2017
GR13.10.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.07.2017
FI12.07.2017
HR12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
RS12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
SE12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
LT12.07.2017
NL12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT12.07.2017
NO12.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2385562  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3,4,11 * abstract * [Y] 12;
 [YA]EP2244489  (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0013] - [0041]; figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [A]US2005040733  (GOLDENBERG ANDREW A [CA], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0078] , [0079] , [0092]; figures 4a,b *;
 [XP]WO2012032443  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-4 * page 8, line 5 - page 10, line 29; figures 4-7 *;
 [A]US2010171393  (PEI QIBING [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0129] , [0130]; figures 21,22 *
by applicantUS2008289952