Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741603

EP2741603 - CONTROL FEEDER WITH LEVEL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/25]POULTRY FEEDER WITH LEVEL SENSOR
[2017/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The GSI Group, Llc
P.O. Box 20
East Illinois Street
Assumption, Illinois 62510 / US
[2018/16]
Former [2014/25]For all designated states
The GSI Group, Llc
P.O. Box 20
East Illinois Street
Assumption, Illinois 62510 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PICKENS, Nathan
2763 Brookville Place
Decatur, Illinois 62521-5601 / US
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)White, Andrew Gordon
AGCO
Intellectual Property Department
Abbey Park
Stoneleigh
Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB
[2018/16]
Former [2014/25]Ström & Gulliksson AB
P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date12822620.608.08.2012
[2018/16]
WO2012US49921
Priority number, dateUS201161521639P09.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161521639 P
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013022926
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2741603
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2741603
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/292, A01K39/012
[2015/17]
Former International [2014/25]A01K39/012, A01K39/00, A01K5/02, G01G15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINER FÜTTERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT FÜLLSTANDSENSOR[2017/40]
English:CONTROL FEEDER WITH LEVEL SENSOR[2017/40]
French:MANGEOIRE DE CONTROLE AVEC CAPTEUR DE NIVEAU[2017/40]
Former [2014/25]GEFLÜGELFÜTTERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT FÜLLSTANDSENSOR
Former [2014/25]POULTRY FEEDER WITH LEVEL SENSOR
Former [2014/25]MANGEOIRE POUR VOLAILLES AVEC CAPTEUR DE NIVEAU
Entry into regional phase05.03.2014National basic fee paid 
05.03.2014Search fee paid 
05.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
14.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2017Fee for grant paid
24.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.09.2017
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
IE08.08.2018
LU08.08.2018
PT20.08.2018
BE31.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/33]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
IE08.08.2018
LU08.08.2018
PT20.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
LU08.08.2018
PT20.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
LU08.08.2018
PT20.08.2018
CH31.08.2018
LI31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US4890577  (MAIBACH BRUCE A [US]) [X] 1-3,11,14 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 43 * * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 36 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [IA]US2010200089  (FLESHNER THOMAS D [US]) [I] 1-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 19] , [0 23] - [0027] * * figures 1-6 * [A] 9,10
International search[X]US2010200089  (FLESHNER THOMAS D.);
 [A]US4890577  (MAIBACH; BRUCE A.);
 [A]US5724912  (CULL; THOMAS J.);
 [A]US2006185604  (NECKEL, E. A.)