Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741811

EP2741811 - SYMPTOM-TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robertson, James R.
P.O. Box 44086
Indianapolis, Indiana 46244 / US
[2018/41]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Robertson, James R.
P.O. Box 44086
Indianapolis, Indiana 46244 / US
Former [2014/25]For all designated states
Robertson, James R.
P.O. Box 44086
Indianapolis, Indiana 46244 / US
For all designated states
Midkiff, Todd C.
15319 Follow Drive
Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US
For all designated states
Mendenhall, Andrew B.
443 Tulip Drive
Mooresville, Indiana 46158 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Robertson, James R.
P.O. Box 44086
Indianapolis, Indiana 46244 / US
02 / Midkiff, Todd C.
15319 Follow Drive
Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US
03 / Mendenhall, Andrew B.
443 Tulip Drive
Mooresville, Indiana 46158 / US
 [2018/41]
Former [2014/42]01 / Robertson, James R.
P.O. Box 44086
Indianapolis, IN 46244 / US
02 / Midkiff, Todd C.
15319 Follow Drive
Noblesville, IN 46060 / US
03 / Mendenhall, Andrew B.
443 Tulip Drive
Mooresville, IN 46158 / US
Former [2014/25]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Flutter, Paula , et al
EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2018/41]
Former [2014/25]Kenrick, Mark Lloyd
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester, M1 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date12822680.013.08.2012
[2018/41]
WO2012US50536
Priority number, dateUS201161522550P11.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161522550 P
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013023207
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2741811
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2741811
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.04.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/18, A61N1/34, A61N1/24, A61N1/04, A61M21/00
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SYMPTOMEN[2014/25]
English:SYMPTOM-TREATMENT SYSTEM[2014/25]
French:SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE SYMPTÔMES[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2014National basic fee paid 
10.03.2014Search fee paid 
10.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
29.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2018Fee for grant paid
25.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2016
Opposition(s)11.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.10.2017Request for further processing filed
02.10.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.10.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
SM10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/25]ES10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
RS10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]ES10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]ES10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US5514175  (KIM KI HO [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5 * columns 1,4-6; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE102006023824  (CERBOMED GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0061] - [0064]; figures 8-9; claims 1-14 *;
 [X]WO2009154458  (NASOPHLEX B V [NL]; DE VOS GERRIT JOHANNIS [NL]) [X] 1,3 * pages 14-15; figure 3c *;
 [X]US2010168822  (SZELES JOZSEF CONSTANTIN [AT]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0053]; figures 8-9 *;
 [A]JP2005006919  (KATAOKA AKIRA; KATAOKA FUSAKO) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011030210  (MEDIZINISHE UNI WIEN [AT]; SZELES JOSEF CONSTANTIN [AT]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4966164  (RONNIE COLSEN ET AL.);
 [Y]JP2005006919  (AKIRA KATAOKA ET AL.);
 [Y]US2011093049  (UWE HINRICHSEN ET AL.);
 [A]US6091989  (CHARLES D. SWERDLOW ET AL.)
by applicantUS5514175
 DE102006023824
 WO2009154458
 US2010168822