Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741606

EP2741606 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR EXTRACTION OF BIOACTIVE POLYELECTROLYTES FROM HUMIFIED ORGANIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.12.2017  [2017/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BPW Sciences, LP
700 South Henderson Road
S-202 King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
[2014/25]
Inventor(s)01 / BLACK, Gary, W.
1139 Elbelhare Road
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12822707.103.08.2012
WO2012US49530
Priority number, dateUS201161521172P08.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161521172 P
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013022752
Date:14.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2741606
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.02.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07D407/12, C07D493/04
[2017/10]
Former International [2014/25]A01N25/00, C07C55/00, C07C51/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR EXTRAKTION VON BIOAKTIVEN POLYELEKTROLYTEN AUS BEFEUCHTETEN ORGANISCHEN MATERIALIEN[2014/25]
English:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR EXTRACTION OF BIOACTIVE POLYELECTROLYTES FROM HUMIFIED ORGANIC MATERIALS[2014/25]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS D'EXTRACTION DE POLYÉLECTROLYTES BIOACTIFS DE MATIÈRES ORGANIQUES HUMIFIÉES[2014/25]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2014National basic fee paid 
07.03.2014Search fee paid 
07.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/25]
03.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/52]
09.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US7896944  (KARR);
 [Y]US6766694  (HUBSCHEN);
 [Y]US2011060132  (LEWIS);
 [Y]US2009208598  (NOVITSKY ET AL.);
 [Y]US4627292  (DEKRONE)
 [Y]  - ALBERS ET AL., "13C-NMR Chemical Shift Databases as a Quick Tool to Evaluate Structural Models of Humic Substances", (20100202), page 98, XP055144282
 [Y]  - PUBCHEM, (20050328), Database accession no. 5359407, XP003032557
 [Y]  - RAMUNNI ET AL., "Use of ultrasonic treatment for extraction of humic acid with inorganic reagents from soil", ORG. GEOCHEM, (1985), vol. 8, pages 241 - 246, XP055144291

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0146-6380(85)90002-6
by applicantUS7896944
    - RAMUNNI A.U. ET AL., ORG. GEOCHEM., (1985), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 241 - 246
    - STEVENSON F.J., Humua Chemistry: Genesis, Composition, Reactions, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INTERSCIENCE, (1982), page 443
    - BUFFLE J.; GRETER F.L.; HAERDI W., "Measurements of Complexation Properties of Humic and Fulvic Acids in Natural Water, With Lead & Copper Ion-Selective Electrodes", ANAL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 49, pages 216 - 222