Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2741606 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2741606



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 232
20.11.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
09.08.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
21.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 25
20.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 19
20.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
20.10.2016 Description Search / examination 19
20.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.03.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
03.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.08.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
26.08.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
23.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
23.04.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 2
13.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.2014 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.03.2014 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 2
07.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.02.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
18.12.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
14.02.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.02.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25