Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797632

EP2797632 - ENDO180-TARGETED PARTICLES FOR SELECTIVE DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.12.2017  [2017/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QBI Enterprises Ltd.
Weizmann Science Park
P.O. Box 4071
7403626 Nes Ziona / IL
For all designated states
Ramot at Tel-Aviv University Ltd.
P.O. Box 39296
6139201 Tel-Aviv / IL
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / FEINSTEIN, Elena
13/55 HaCarmel Street
7630513 Rehovot / IL
02 / PEER, Dan
14 Hapardes Street
Apartment 27
5552572 Kiryat Ono / IL
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Sellin, Carole , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date12823110.731.12.2012
WO2012IL00405
Priority number, dateUS201261582373P01.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261582373 P
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098813
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797632
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/48, A61P35/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:AUF ENDO180 GEZIELTE PARTIKEL ZUR SELEKTIVEN VERABREICHUNG VON THERAPIE- UND DIAGNOSEMITTELN[2014/45]
English:ENDO180-TARGETED PARTICLES FOR SELECTIVE DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC AGENTS[2014/45]
French:PARTICULES CIBLANT ENDO180 POUR L'ADMINISTRATION SÉLECTIVE D'AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES ET DIAGNOSTIQUES[2014/45]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
10.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/50]
04.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]  - ALO NAG AND PRAHLAD C. GOSH, "Assessment of Targeting Potential of Galactosylated and Mannosylated Sterically Stabilized Liposomes to Different Cell Types of Mouse Liver", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, (19990601), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 427 - 438, XP008161495 [X] 1,12,13,15,24-27 * Abstract, page 2 second column, second paragraph; page 3 first column * [Y] 5,6,14,16-23,29-31 [I] 2-4,32-39

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10611869908996849
 [XYI]  - BANERJEE ET AL., "Mannose-coated liposomal Hamycin in the treatment of experimental Leishmaniassis in Hamsters", BIOCHEMICAL MEDICINE AND METABOLIC BIOLOGY, (19940601), vol. 53, pages 1 - 7, XP002695597 [X] 1,3,12,15,24,25,27,28,33,35 * Abstract, page 429, paragraphs 2 and 3 * [Y] 5,6,14,29-31 [I] 40

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bmmb.1994.1050
 [Y]  - TANAKA Y. ET AL., "Liposomes with Differential Lipid Components Exert differential Adjuvanticity in antigen-Liposome Conjugates via Differential Recognition by Macrophages", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20031231), vol. 15, pages 35 - 40, XP002695598 [Y] 16-23 * Abstract; page 36 4th paragraph. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BC034134O
 [A]  - HOWARD M.J. ET AL., OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, (20030701), vol. 12, pages 74 - 82, XP002695599 [A] 1-40 * Abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.JOCA.2003.07.001
 [A]  - MADSEN D.H. ET AL., "The non-phagocytic Route of collagen Uptake", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20110729), vol. 286, no. 30, pages 26996 - 27010, XP002695600 [A] 1-40 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M110.208033
 [A]  - MADSEN D ET AL, "Blocking cellular collagen degradation with monoclonal antibodies against uPARAP/Endo180", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS; 10TH INTERENATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY OF PLASMINOGEN ACTIVATION; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; APRIL 09 -13, 2005, SCHATTAUER GMBH, DE; US, (20050401), vol. 93, no. 4, ISSN 0340-6245, page A22, XP008124080 [A] 1-40 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004100759
 WO2010111198
 US2009232730
 US2010008937
 US4235871
 WO8600238
 US5574142
 WO2004015107
 WO0244321
 US5898031
 US6107094
 US7452987
 US2005042647
 WO2008020435
 EP0586520
 EP0618925
 US6586238
 US6602858
 US5225539
 US6838254
 US4376110
 US4816567
 US6331415
 US6548640
 US6982321
 WO9007861
 US5585089
 US5693761
 US6180370
 US7022500
 WO0136646
 WO2009044392
 WO2011066475
 WO2011085056
 US5225182
 US5169383
 US5167616
 US4959217
 US4925678
 US4487603
 US4486194
 US4447233
 US4447224
 US4439196
 US4475196
 US4666828
 US4683202
 US4801531
 US5192659
 US5272057
 US3791932
 US3839153
 US3850752
 US3850578
 US3853987
 US3867517
 US3879262
 US3901654
 US3935074
 US3984533
 US3996345
 US4034074
 US4098876
 US4879219
 US5011771
 US5281521
    - ISACKE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, pages 2606 - 2618
    - SHEIKH ET AL., J. CELL. SCI., (2000), vol. 113, pages 1021 - 1032
    - BEHRENDT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 1993 - 2002
    - HOWARD; ISACKE, JBC, (2002), vol. 35, pages 32320 - 31
    - BEHRENDT., BIOL CHEM., (2004), vol. 385, no. 2, pages 103 - 36
    - KJOLLE ET AL., EXP CELL RES., (2004), vol. 293, no. 1, pages 106 - 16
    - WIENKE ET AL., CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 67, no. 21, pages 10230 - 40
    - SZOKA JR. ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467
    - UI-TEI ET AL., J BIOMED BIOTECHNOL., (2006), page 65052
    - CHALK ET AL., BBRC, (2004), vol. 319, no. 1, pages 264 - 74
    - SIOUD; LEIRDAL, MET. MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 252, pages 457 - 69
    - LEVENKOVA ET AL., BIOINFORM, (2004), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 430 - 2
    - UI-TEI ET AL., NAR, (2004), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 936 - 48
    - BRAASCH ET AL., BIOCHEM., (2003), vol. 42, no. 26, pages 7967 - 75
    - CHIU ET AL., RNA, (2003), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 1034 - 48
    - AMARZGUIOUI ET AL., NAR, (2003), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 589 - 595
    - HOLEN ET AL., NAR, (2003), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 2401 - 2407
    - CHIU; RANA, RNA, (2003), vol. 9, pages 1034 - 1048
    - CZAUDERNA ET AL., NAR, (2003), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 2705 - 2716
    - ELMEN ET AL., NAR, (2005), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 439 - 447
    - TAKEI ET AL., JBC, (2002), vol. 277, no. 26, pages 23800 - 06
    - BEAUCAGE SL; IYER RP, TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 48, pages 2223 - 2311
    - BEAUCAGE S.; IYER RP, TETRAHEDRON, (1993), vol. 49, pages 6123 - 6194
    - CARUTHERS MH, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 287 - 313
    - ECKSTEIN F., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 54, pages 367 - 402
    - SPROAT B., RNA molecules, HUMANA PRESS, (2005), pages 17 - 31
    - PINGOUD A., RNA MOLECULES, IRL PRESS, (1989), pages 183 - 208
    - KIM., MOL. CELLS., (2005), vol. 19, pages 1 - 15
    - AGNEW, CHEM INTL. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186
    - ABOUL-FADL T., CURR MED CHEM., (2005), vol. 12, no. 19, pages 2193 - 214
    - CROOKE ST, CURR MOI MED., (2004), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 465 - 87
    - CROOKE ST, ANN REV MED., (2004), vol. 55, pages 61 - 95
    - VACEK M ET AL., CELL MOL LIFE SCI., (2003), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 825 - 33
    - CHO-CHUNG YS, ARCH PHARM RES., (2003), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 183 - 91
    - CROOKE ET AL., HEMATOL PATHOL., (1995), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 59 - 72
    - WAGNER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 372, no. 6504, pages 333 - 5
    - SCANLON ET AL., FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, no. 13, pages 1288 - 96
    - WAGNER ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (1996), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 840 - 4
    - CALABRETTA ET AL., SEMIN ONCOL., (1996), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 78 - 87
    - ANAZODO ET AL., BBRC, (1996), vol. 229, pages 305 - 309
    - AGRAWAL ET AL., PNAS U S A., (1997), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 2620 - 5
    - MORRISON, J BIOL CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, no. 2, pages 728 - 34
    - AKHTER ET AL., NAR, (1991), vol. 19, pages 5551 - 5559
    - LOKE ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, no. 10, pages 3474 - 8
    - YAKUBOV ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, no. 17, pages 6454 - 58
    - GIL ET AL., APOPTOSIS, (2000), vol. 5, pages 107 - 114
    - ELBASHIR ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498
    - CAPLEN ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 9742 - 9747
    - FIRE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, page 806
    - AMBROS V., NATURE, (2004), vol. 431, pages 350 - 355
    - BARTEL DP., CELL, (2004), vol. 116, no. 2, pages 281 - 97
    - ELBASHIR ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, page 188
    - BERNSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 363 - 6
    - LEE ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 415 - 9
    - MCMANUS; SHARP, NATURE REV GENET, (2002), vol. 3, pages 737 - 47
    - PADDISON; HANNON, CURR OPIN MOL THER., (2003), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 217 - 24
    - BERNSTEIN ET AL., RNA, (2001), vol. 7, no. 11, pages 1509 - 21
    - NISHIKURA, CELL, (2001), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 415 - 8
    - NAT. MED., (2005), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 50 - 55
    - MOL. MED, (2005), vol. 83, pages 764 - 773
    - CHAKRABORTY, CURRENT DRUG TARGETS, (2007), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 469 - 82
    - KAISER, AM J OPHTHALMOL., (2006), vol. 142, no. 4, pages 660 - 8
    - DURCAN, MOL. PHARMA., (2008), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 559 - 566
    - KIM; ROSSI, BIOTECHNIQUES, (2008), vol. 44, pages 613 - 616
    - GRIMM; KAY, JCI, (2007), vol. 117, no. 12, pages 3633 - 41
    - YU ET AL., "Therapeutic strategies to halt renal fibrosis", CURR OPIN PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 177 - 81
    - KEANE; LYLE, "Recent advances in management of type 2 diabetes and nephropathy: lessons from the RENAAL study", AM J KIDNEY DIS., (2003), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1053/ajkd.2003.50078, pages 22 - 5, XP028915158

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/ajkd.2003.50078
    - BOHLE ET AL., "The pathogenesis of chronic renal failure", PATHOL RES PRACT., (1989), vol. 185, no. 4, pages 421 - 40
    - KIKKAWA ET AL., "Mechanism of the progression of diabetic nephropathy to renal failure", KIDNEY INT, (1997), vol. 62, pages 539 - 40
    - BATALLER; BRENNER, "Hepatic stellate cells as a target for the treatment of liver fibrosis", SEMIN LIVER DIS., (2001), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 437 - 51
    - GROSS; HUNNINGHAKE, "Idiopathic pulmonary fibrosis", N ENGL J MED., (2001), vol. 345, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMra003200, pages 517 - 25, XP008154238

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMra003200
    - FROHLICH, "Fibrosis and ischemia: the real risks in hypertensive heart disease", AM J HYPERTENS, (2001), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 194S - 199S, XP002338426
    - WATSON ET AL., Recombinant DNA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN BOOKS
    - BIRREN ET AL, Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1998), vol. 1-4
    - TESTONI ET AL., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 87, page 3822
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - "Protein engineering of single-chain Fv analogs and fusion proteins", HUSTON ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1991), vol. 203, pages 46 - 88
    - "Construction of single-chain Fvb derivatives of monoclonal antibodies and their production in Escherichia coli", JOHNSON; BIRD, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1991), vol. 203, pages 88 - 99
    - "An overview of phage-displayed recombinant antibodies", MEMAUGH; MEMAUGH, Molecular Methods In Plant Pathology, CRC PRESS INC., (1995), pages 359 - 365
    - PEER; MARGALIT, ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHY, (2000), vol. 383, no. 2, pages 185 - 90
    - PEER; MARGALIT, NEOPLASIA, (2004), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 343 - 53
    - PEER ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 319, no. 5863, pages 627 - 630
    - LANDESMAN-MILO ET AL., CANCER LETT., (2012), pages 0304 - 3835
    - KEDMI ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2010), vol. 31, no. 26, pages 6867 - 75
    - KEDMI; PEER, NANOMED, (2009), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 853 - 5
    - PEER; MARGALIT, INT J CANCER, (2004), vol. 108, pages 780 - 789
    - BACHAR ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2011), vol. 32, pages 4840 - 4848
 WO2008IL00248
 WO2008IL01197