Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2795957

EP2795957 - BANDWIDTH MANAGEMENT IN A HOME NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2016/40]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / GODIN, André
726 Ovide
Laval, Quebec H7R 5X2 / CA
02 / GAVITA, Edoardo
2000 Arthur-Rousseau
Laval, Quebec H7M 4N4 / CA
03 / KATYAL, Ganish
755 Montpellier, 612
Ville Saint Laurent, H4L 4R1 / CA
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/40]
Former [2014/44]Röthinger, Rainer , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12823261.819.12.2012
[2016/40]
WO2012IB57495
Priority number, dateUS20111333007019.12.2011         Original published format: US201113330070
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013093810
Date:27.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2795957
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2795957
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/20
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BANDBREITENVERWALTUNG IN EINEM HEIMNETZWERK[2014/44]
English:BANDWIDTH MANAGEMENT IN A HOME NETWORK[2014/44]
French:GESTION DE LA BANDE PASSANTE SUR UN RÉSEAU DOMESTIQUE[2014/44]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
17.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.07.2016Fee for grant paid
15.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.08.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
26.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2016
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
TR05.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
MT19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU19.12.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
MT19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2018/30]HU19.12.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE19.12.2016
LU19.12.2016
CH31.12.2016
LI31.12.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/42]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006268738  (GOERKE THOMAS E [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0046] - [0078] - [0087] *;
 [A]US2010027494  (KWON CHANG-YEUL [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008060071  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]; KWON CHANG-YEUL [KR]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0050] *;
 [A]WO2008023957  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]; KWON CHANG-YEUL [KR]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - OKSMAN V ET AL, "G.hn: The new ITU-T home networking standard", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20091001), vol. 47, no. 10, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2009.5273821, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 138 - 145, XP011283328 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2009.5273821