Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2753634

EP2753634 - METHOD FOR PREPARING ACTIVE FORM OF TNFR-FC FUSION PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ares Trading S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
[2017/44]
Former [2016/15]For all designated states
Ares Trading S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
Hanwha Chemical Corporation
Hanwha Building
1, Janggyo-dong, Jung-gu
Seoul 100-797 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / WON, Hye Soon
301 Myeongwoovill
124-10 Sinseong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-804 / KR
02 / SUNG, Byung Je
207-1604 Saemmeori Apt.
Dunsan 2-dong
Seo-gu
Daejeon 302-777 / KR
03 / AHN, Yong Ho
902 Royal Valley
Doryong-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
04 / PARK, Sang Kyung
311-401 Banseok Maeul Apt.
Jijok-dong
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-773 / KR
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Terre Bonne Business Park A2
Route de Crassier 15
1162 Eysins / CH
[N/P]
Former [2017/44]Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
Former [2014/29]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date12823797.117.08.2012
[2017/44]
WO2012KR06564
Priority number, dateKR2011008185417.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110081854
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013025079
Date:21.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2753634
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2013
[2014/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2753634
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.02.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/715, C07K1/20, C07K1/22, C07K1/18, C07K19/00
[2015/21]
Former International [2014/29]C07K1/20, C07K1/22, C07K1/18, C07K19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AKTIVEN FORM DES TNFR-FC-FUSIONSPROTEINS[2014/29]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING ACTIVE FORM OF TNFR-FC FUSION PROTEIN[2014/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE FORME ACTIVE DE LA PROTÉINE DE FUSION TNFR-FC[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2014National basic fee paid 
12.03.2014Search fee paid 
12.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2017Fee for grant paid
25.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2018   
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Herzogspitalstr. 11
80331 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Rückerl, Florian
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patentanwälte PartmbB
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
 [2018/36]
16.08.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.12.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
31.10.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU17.08.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2019/15]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]AT01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2005075498  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * Whole document, especially page 13 line 18-page 14, line 2. Example 2 *;
 [I]WO2005042569  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * Whole document, especially page 16 lines 10-14. *;
 [I]WO03072060  (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * Whole document, especially page 16 line 20-24 *;
 [A]WO2009111347  (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - EVANS ET AL, "Purification of an Fc-fusion biologic: Clearance of multiple product related impurities by hydrophobic interaction chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20071226), vol. 1177, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2007.07.049, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 265 - 271, XP022401694 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2007.07.049
International search[A]US2005136521  (SHUKLA ABHINAV A [US], et al);
 [X]  - KYOGOKU, K. ET AL., "PRODUCTION OF RECOMBINANT TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR/FC FUSION PROTEIN BY GENETICALLY MANIPULATED CHICKEN", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, (2008), vol. 105, no. 5, pages 454 - 459, XP022733110

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1263/jbb.105.454
 [A]  - EVANS, D. R. H. ET AL., "Purification of an Fc-fusion biologic: Clearance of multiple product related impurities by hydrophobic interaction chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2008), vol. 1177, pages 265 - 271, XP022401694

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2007.07.049
 [A]  - TIWARI, N. ET AL., "Identification and characterization of native proteins of Escherichia coli BL-21 that display affinity towards Immobilized Metal Affinity Chromatography and Hydrophobic Interaction Chromatography Matrices", PROTEIN EXPRESSIO AND PURIFICATION, (2010), vol. 70, pages 191 - 195, XP026915652

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2009.10.018
 [A]  - ZOLODZ, M. D. ET AL., "Separation by hydrophobic interaction chromatography and structural determination by mass spectrometry of mannosylated glycoforms of a recombinant transferrin-exendin-4 fusion protein from yeast", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (2010), vol. 1217, no. 2, pages 225 - 234, XP026817105
 [A]  - KOHNO, T. ET AL., "Binding Characteristics of Tumor Necrosis Factor Receptor-Fc Fusion Proteins vs Anti-Tumor Necrosis Factor mAbs", J. INVESTIG. DERMATOL. SYMP PROC., (200705), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 5 - 8, XP055144570

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jidsymp.5650034
 [A]  - MURRAY, K. M. ET AL., "RECOMBINANT HUMAN TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR (P75) FC FUSION PROTEIN (TNFR:FC) OM RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS", THE ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY, (1997), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1335 - 1338, XP000952552
Examination   - "Hydrophobic Interaction and Reversed Phase Chromatography - Principles and Methods", (20060201), URL: http://wolfson.huji.ac.il/purification/PDF/HCIC/AMERSHAM_HIC_RPC.pdf, (20131125), XP055090096
by applicantWO2005075498
 WO2005042569
 WO03072060
OppositionUS2008076155
 WO2005075498
 WO0036092
 WO2009111347
    - A. Shukla, Yinges Yigzaw, "6 - Modes of Preparative Chromatography", A. Shukla, Yinges Yigzaw, Shukla, A. et al., Process Scale Bioseparations for the Biopharmaceutical Industry, CRC Press, (20070000), pages 5pp, 179 - 225, XP055508081
    - "Hydrophobic Interaction and Reversed Phase Chromatography - Principles and Methods", (20060201), URL: http://wolfson.huji.ac.il/purification/PDF/HCIC/AMERSHAM_HIC_RPC.pdf, XP055090096
    - Evans; Macniven D R H; Labanca R P; Walker M; Notarnicola J; S M, "Purification of an Fc-fusion biologic: Clearance of multiple product related impurities by hydrophobic interaction chromatography", Journal of Chromatography A, (20080000), vol. 1177, no. 2, pages 265 - 271, XP022401694

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2007.07.049