Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749531

EP2749531 - SILICON CARBIDE POWDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Taiheiyo Cement Corporation
3-5 Daiba 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 135-8578 / JP
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / MASUDA, Kenta
c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
Central Research&Development Center
4-2 Osaku 2-chome
Sakura-shi
Chiba 285-8655 / JP
02 / ICHITSUBO, Kouki
c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
Central Research&Development Center
4-2 Osaku 2-chome
Sakura-shi
Chiba 285-8655 / JP
03 / KAWANO, Kohei
c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
Central Research&Development Center
4-2 Osaku2-chome
Sakura-shi
Chiba 285-8655 / JP
04 / SUZUKI, Masakazu
c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
Central Research&Development Center
4-2 Osaku 2-chome
Sakura-shi
Chiba 285-8655 / JP
05 / KUMASAKA, Atsushi
c/o TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION
Central Research&Development Center
4-2 Osaku 2-chome
Sakura-shi
Chiba 285-8655 / JP
06 / TANAKA, Hideaki
c/o YAKUSHIMA DENKO CO. LTD.
Yakushima Office
Miyanoura 939
Yakushima-cho, Kumage-gun
Kagoshima 891-4205 / JP
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date12825897.723.08.2012
WO2012JP71270
Priority number, dateJP2011018293324.08.2011         Original published format: JP 2011182933
[2014/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013027790
Date:28.02.2013
Language:JA
[2013/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2749531
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.02.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:C01B31/36
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
TitleGerman:SILICIUMCARBIDPULVER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/27]
English:SILICON CARBIDE POWDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2014/27]
French:POUDRE DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE CELLE-CI[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2014Translation filed 
26.02.2014National basic fee paid 
26.02.2014Search fee paid 
26.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
02.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2012163534  (EVONIK SOLAR NORGE AS [NO], et al) [E] 1-6 * claims 1,2,5,6,9,10 * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 13 * * page 12, line 3 - line 13 *;
 [XI]EP0197224  (KENNECOTT CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 24 * [I] 2-6;
 [X]EP0486938  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 33 *;
 [A]EP0476422  (LONZA AG [CH]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * examples 2, 3 *
 [X]  - WERHEIT H ET AL, "Comparative optical investigations of sintered and monocrystalline black and green silicon carbide (SiC)", JOURNAL OF SOLID STATE CHEMISTRY ACADEMIC PRESS USA, (200402), vol. 177, no. 2, ISSN 0022-4596, pages 580 - 585, XP002737942 [X] 1 * page 581, left-hand column, "2.1. Acheson-SiC single crystals" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jssc.2003.04.006
 [X]  - CSATO I ET AL, "DIRECT ANALYSIS OF SILICON CARBIDE POWDER BY TOTAL REFLECTION X-RAYFLUORESCENCE SPECTROMETRY", APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, THE SOCIETY FOR APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY. BALTIMORE, US, (19970701), vol. 51, no. 7, doi:10.1366/0003702971941502, ISSN 0003-7028, pages 1067 - 1072, XP000698756 [X] 1 * page 1070, table II * * page 1071, table III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1366/0003702971941502
 [A]  - LI-YING ZHOU ET AL, "Purifying Mechanism in the Acheson Process A Thermodynamic Study", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM TRANS TECH PUBLICATIONS LTD. SWITZERLAND, (20100429), vol. 645-648, ISSN 0255-5476, pages 41 - 44, XP002737943 [A] 1,2 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.645-648.41
International search[X]JPS6362449B  (SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [X]WO2010037692  (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al);
 [X]JPS6227316  (IBIDEN CO LTD);
 [X]JPS5848487B  (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO., LTD.);
 [X]JPS6461308  (TOKAI KONETSU KOGYO KK);
 [Y]JPH04270106  (LONZA AG)
by applicantJPS6461308
 JP4006716B
    - BUNSEKI KAGAKU, vol. 47, no. 7, pages 451 - 454