Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2749927

EP2749927 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change: Appeal number 
19.07.2019New entry: Appeal number 
19.07.2019New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIOKA, Shigeatsu
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / YAMANE, Kenji
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / TAGAMI, Naoki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2017/14]
Former [2014/27]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12826830.712.07.2012
[2017/14]
WO2012JP04510
Priority number, dateJP2011018489526.08.2011         Original published format: JP 2011184895
[2014/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013031077
Date:07.03.2013
Language:JA
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2749927
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2749927
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G02B21/36, G06F3/0485, G06T7/00, G06T7/33
[2019/25]
Former International [2016/44]G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G02B21/36, G06F3/0485, G06T7/00
Former International [2015/18]G02B21/36, G01N21/17, G09G5/00, G09G5/36, G09G5/38, G06F3/0485, G06T7/00
Former International [2014/27]G02B21/36, G01N21/17, G09G5/00, G09G5/36, G09G5/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG[2014/27]
English:INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD[2014/27]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2013Translation filed 
18.04.2013National basic fee paid 
18.04.2013Search fee paid 
18.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2013Examination requested  [2014/27]
24.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2017Fee for grant paid
21.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.12.2017   
Carl Zeiss Microscopy GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10
07745 Jena / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 [2018/06]
26.01.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.05.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
28.05.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.05.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.07.2019Appeal received No.  T2077/19
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.07.2012
AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IE12.07.2017
LU12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IE12.07.2017
LU12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IE12.07.2017
LU12.07.2017
MT12.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IE12.07.2017
LU12.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IE12.07.2017
LU12.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IE12.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
CH31.07.2017
LI31.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0184209  (SOENKSEN DIRK [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1, 5, 6 * * page 44, line 10 - page 51, line 20 * [I] 2-9;
 [X]US2006058624  (KIMURA TOKUNORI [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2011176731  (FUKUSHI GAKUHO [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [X]US2006050948  (SUMIDA YOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0084] *;
 [X]US2011141103  (COHEN AVRUM I [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2008142417  (ZIOSOFT INC);
 [A]JP2003161893  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO);
 [A]JP2007024927  (OLYMPUS CORP);
 [A]JPS62269924  (SLIDEX CORP);
 [A]JP2002229537  (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP);
 [A]JP2010243597  (SONY CORP)
by applicantJP2009037250
OppositionUS2009141126
 US2002135678
    - B. LAHRMANN et al., "Robust Gridding of TMAs After Whole-Slide Imaging Using Tem- plate Matching", Cytometry Part A, (20100000), vol. 77A, pages 1169 - 1176, XP055448031

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.a.20949
    - CARL ZEISS, AxioVision - Perform to Perfection, (20100200), XP055448034
    - J. SI et al., "Detecting regions of interest in images", SPIE Newsroom, (20060500), pages 1 - 3, XP055448048
    - J. PETERWITZ, "Grundlagen: Bildverarbeitung/Objekterkennung", Seminararbeit, Fakultat f0r Informatik, (20060705), pages 1 - 34, XP055347011
    - A. BHALERAO, "Multiresolution Image Segmentation", PD thesis, (19911100), XP055448058
    - J. WANG et al., "Unsupervised Multiresolution Segmentation for Images with Low Depth of Field", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20010100), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 85 - 90, XP001008999

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.899949