Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750604

EP2750604 - WEARABLE PULSE OXIMETRY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxitone Medical Ltd.
Tzomet Abba Hillel North Ind. Zone POB 7284
78172 Ashkelon / IL
[2017/17]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
Oxitone Medical Ltd.
Tzomet Abba Hillel North Ind. Zone POB 7284
78172 Ashkelon / IL
Inventor(s)01 / EISEN, Leon
67/38 Haatsmaut Street
77452 Ashdod / IL
02 / FINE, Ilya
52G/33 Hanasi Harishon Street
76302 Rechovot / IL
03 / GOLDINOV, Leonid
8/6 Yavne Road
76343 Rechovot / IL
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[2017/40]
Former [2014/28]Herrmann, Johanna , et al
Industrial Property Services GmbH
Rosenweg 14
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
Application number, filing date12827666.426.08.2012
[2017/40]
WO2012IB54349
Priority number, dateUS201161528851P30.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161528851 P
GB2011001488130.08.2011         Original published format: GB 201114881
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013030744
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750604
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750604
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/145, A61B5/00
[2014/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGBARE PULSOXIMETRIEVORRICHTUNG[2014/28]
English:WEARABLE PULSE OXIMETRY DEVICE[2014/28]
French:DISPOSITIF D'OXYMÉTRIE PULSÉE PORTABLE[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2014National basic fee paid 
21.03.2014Search fee paid 
21.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
30.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2017Fee for grant paid
26.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2015
Opposition(s)05.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201504   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
MC04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SI04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RO04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT04.10.2017
CZ04.10.2017
EE04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
SK04.10.2017
SM04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT04.10.2017
HR04.10.2017
LT04.10.2017
LV04.10.2017
RS04.10.2017
BG04.01.2018
GR05.01.2018
IS04.02.2018
Former [2018/22]LT04.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2006089763  (BUSCHMANN JOHANNES P [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-16 * pages 11-21; figures 2a, 2b, 6C * [Y] 8,17 [I] 9,18;
 [Y]  - AMIR KUGELMAN ET AL, "Reflectance Pulse Oximetry from Core Body in Neonates and Infants: Comparison to Arterial Blood Oxygen Saturation and to Transmission Pulse Oximetry", JOURNAL OF PERINATOLOGY, (20040601), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1038/sj.jp.7211102, ISSN 0743-8346, pages 366 - 371, XP055174783 [Y] 8,17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jp.7211102
International search[Y]US2009054751  (BABASHAN BRUCE [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007142717  (LOWERY GUY R [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2011013132  (OXITONE MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al);
 [Y]US2006129040  (FINE ILYA [IL], et al);
 [Y]US2009209834  (FINE ILYA [IL]);
 [A]EP2178438  (BERNREUTER PETER [DE]);
 [A]US2009306487  (CROWE JOHN [GB], et al);
 [A]WO2011028913  (XU JIA-HAO [US])
ExaminationJP2009254523