Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751576

EP2751576 - PRESENTATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOW-VOLUME SOLUTION SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Molecular Devices LLC
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2017/10]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
Molecular Devices, LLC
1311 Orleans Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TANG, Hamilton Roger
342 Alicia Way
Los Altos, California 94022 / US
02 / YOUNGQUIST, Michael George
452 Marion Avenue
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
03 / ZHU, Chang
5520 Alvelais Drive
Union City, California 94587 / US
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Application number, filing date12827821.529.08.2012
[2017/10]
WO2012US52773
Priority number, dateUS20111322159130.08.2011         Original published format: US201113221591
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013033146
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2751576
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2751576
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/00, G01N1/36, B01L3/00, B01L9/00, G01N21/03, G01N21/25
[2015/21]
Former International [2014/28]G01N35/00, G01N1/36
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRÄSENTATIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR KLEINVOLUMIG AUFGELÖSTE PROBEN[2014/28]
English:PRESENTATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOW-VOLUME SOLUTION SAMPLES[2014/28]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉSENTATION POUR DES ÉCHANTILLONS DE SOLUTION DE FAIBLE VOLUME[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Search fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
03.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2017Fee for grant paid
24.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.10.2016
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.08.2012
AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
MT29.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
MT29.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
IE29.08.2017
LU29.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/18]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0902271  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-12,15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0030] , [0033] , [0034] , [0055] - [0057] - [0119]; figures 1-10 * [I] 1-15;
 [X]US2002039796  (DORES GERSON BOTACINI DAS [BR] ET AL BOTACINI DAS DORES GERSON [BR] ET) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]WO2010120249  (CURIOX BIOSYSTEMS PTE LTD [SG]; KIM NAMYONG [SG]; CHENG KONG LEONG [SG) [X] 1,3,5-7,9-15 * page 10, line 8 - page 13, line 13; figures 1-16 * * page 18, line 3 - page 19, line 22 * * page 22, line 7 - page 23, line 3 *;
 [X]US5939329  (CHRISTNER JAMES E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-6,9 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 24; figures 1-11 *;
 [X]US2007217955  (KAWAHARA NORIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,3-5,7,10 * paragraphs [0051] - [0059] - [0 68]; figures 1-21 *
International search[A]US2002039796  (DORES, GERSON BOTACINI DAS ET AL.);
 [A]WO0190729  (VERIFICATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.);
 [A]US2010031757  (HOYER, OLAF);
 [A]US2006139621  (BAER, THOMAS M. ET AL.);
 [A]US5939329  (CHRISTNER, JAMES E. ET AL.)
by applicantEP0902271
 US2002039796
 WO2010120249