Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750633

EP2750633 - LINED FEMORAL CUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.04.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.06.2016  [2016/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hip Innovation Technology LLC
95 Main Street
West Orange, NJ 07052 / US
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / TERMANINI, Zafer
208 Eileen Drive
Cedar Grove, NJ 07009 / US
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)De Groote, Christophe , et al
Abyoo sprl
Centre Monnet
Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]De Groote, Christophe , et al
Pecher & de Groote sprl
Centre Monnet
Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
Application number, filing date12828055.918.07.2012
WO2012US47164
Priority number, dateUS201161529955P01.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161529955 P
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013032589
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750633
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/32, A61F2/30, A61F2/36, A61F2/34
[2014/39]
Former International [2014/28]A61F2/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
TitleGerman:GEFÜTTERTE OBERSCHENKELPFANNE[2014/28]
English:LINED FEMORAL CUP[2014/28]
French:COUPE FÉMORALE REVÊTUE[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2014National basic fee paid 
05.03.2014Search fee paid 
05.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
26.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.04.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO2011005194  (MILUX HOLDING SA [LU], et al) [Y] 8,9 * page 18, line 4 - line 7; figure 10 * [A] 1-7;
 [A]WO2011006852  (MELOZZI ALESSANDRO [IT]) [A] 1-7 * figures 3-5 *;
 [A]EP0322493  (LECLERCQ SYLVAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 25 - line 27 *;
 [YA]US7766971  (GLADDISH JR BENNIE W [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * figures 4,36,37,42 * [A] 1-7
International search[X]US7766971  (GLADDISH JR BENNIE W [US], et al);
 [Y]US3916451  (BUECHEL FREDERICK F, et al);
 [Y]US7044974  (GARBER FRANK D [US], et al);
 [Y]US5879407  (WAGGENER HERBERT A [US])