Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750467

EP2750467 - SPECTRUM RESOURCE REALLOCATION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SI
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/23]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Xing
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / LI, Yan
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / MIAO, Ting
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
04 / REN, Longtao
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Raunecker, Klaus Peter
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/23]
Former [2014/27]Raunecker, Klaus Peter
Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date12828163.129.06.2012
[2018/23]
WO2012CN77856
Priority number, dateCN20111024930526.08.2011         Original published format: CN201110249305
[2014/27]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013029417
Date:07.03.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750467
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750467
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/16, H04W16/14, H04L5/00, H04L27/00, H04W72/08, // H04W92/04
[2018/05]
Former International [2015/17]H04W28/16, H04W16/14, // H04W92/04
Former International [2014/27]H04W72/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR NEUZUORDNUNG VON SPEKTRUMSRESSOURCEN[2014/27]
English:SPECTRUM RESOURCE REALLOCATION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM[2014/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE RÉALLOCATION DE RESSOURCES DE SPECTRE[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2014Translation filed 
11.03.2014National basic fee paid 
11.03.2014Search fee paid 
11.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
13.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2018Fee for grant paid
24.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.05.2017
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
DK06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SI06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE29.06.2018
LU29.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
DE01.01.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE29.06.2018
LU29.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
DE01.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE29.06.2018
LU29.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
DE01.01.2019
Former [2019/19]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
IE29.06.2018
LU29.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/17]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
LU29.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/15]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
MC06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
SM06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
RS06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011091250  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]WO2010139057  (WI LAN INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 22, line 31 - page 24, line 30; figures 10A, 10B *
 [X]  - "Reconfigurable Radio Systems (RRS); Use Cases for Operation in White Space Frequency Bands", ETSI DRAFT; RRS(11)0113R1_TR_102_907_USE_CASES_FOR_OP._IN_WS_FREQ._BANDS_FOR_PLENARY_APPROVA, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110808), no. V0.1.5, pages 1 - 60, XP014067053 [X] 1-15 * page 41, line 4 - page 43, line 24; figures 33, 34, 35 * * page 14, line 17 - page 18, line 8; figures 6, 7, 8, 9 * * page 35, line 6 - page 37, line 14 * * page 51, line 34 - line 40 *
International search[X]CN1859600  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN102158970  (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM);
 [A]CN101720112  (ZTE CORP)
ExaminationEP2628348