Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2751839

EP2751839 - Solid state transducer with state detection and method for its fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/28]SOLID STATE TRANSDUCERS WITH STATE DETECTION, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS
[2018/47]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 S. Federal Way P.O. Box 6
Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUBERT, Martin, F.
3914 S. Globe Theatre Avenue
Boise, ID 83716 / US
02 / ODNOBLYUDOV, Vladimir
1363 S. Willow Wood Way
Eagle, ID 83616 / US
 [2014/28]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/28]
Application number, filing date12828253.015.08.2012
WO2012US50855
Priority number, dateUS20111322313631.08.2011         Original published format: US201113223136
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013032699
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2751839
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L25/16, H01L33/00, // H05B33/08, H05B37/02, H01L27/02
[2018/47]
Former International [2015/22]H01L25/16, H01L33/00, // H05B33/08
Former International [2014/28]H01L27/14, H01L33/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
TitleGerman:Festkörperwandler mit Statuserkennung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2018/48]
English:Solid state transducer with state detection and method for its fabrication[2018/47]
French:Transducteur monolithique à détection d'état et son procédé de fabrication[2018/48]
Former [2014/28]FESTSTOFFWANDLER MIT STATUSERKENNUNG SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN
Former [2014/28]SOLID STATE TRANSDUCERS WITH STATE DETECTION, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS
Former [2014/28]TRANSDUCTEURS MONOLITHIQUES À DÉTECTION D'ÉTAT, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS
Entry into regional phase28.03.2014National basic fee paid 
28.03.2014Search fee paid 
28.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
27.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4967241  (KINOSHITA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11,13,15 * columns 2-5; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-6,9,12,14;
 [XA]US2010207127  (CHEN CHEN-YU [TW]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0062]; figures 2,3,5,6,7 * [A] 3,5,8-10,13-15;
 [XA]US2011198621  (CHOI KWANG KI [KR], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,11,14 * paragraphs [0011] - [0140]; figures 1,3,4-13 * [A] 2-4,6,9,10,12,13,15;
 [XA]US2008251794  (KODA RINTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0033] - [0045] - [0070] - [0089]; figure 8 * [A] 2-8,10-15
International search[X]US7706421  (HOSKING LUCY G [US]);
 [Y]US2006202914  (ASHDOWN IAN [CA]);
 [Y]US2007170450  (MURPHY THOMAS [DE]);
 [A]WO2010099647  (HK APPLIED SCIENCE & TECH RES [CN], et al);
 [A]US2010267176  (LIU CHUN-KAI [TW], et al)
by applicantUS4967241
 US2010207127
 US2011198621
 US2008251794