blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2751839


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.04.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.04.2019 Change - classification published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
05.04.2019 Change - classification published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.11.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.10.2018 Change - classification published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
26.10.2018 Change - classification published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
26.10.2018 Change - German title published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
26.10.2018 Change - French title published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
19.10.2018 Change - classification published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - classification published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - German title published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - English title published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
19.10.2018 Change - French title published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
14.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.04.2017 First examination report
17.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
12.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.05.2015 Supplementary search report published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - classification published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - classification published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
07.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
06.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
19.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
06.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  09.07.2014  [2014/28]
07.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication