Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2748879

EP2748879 - OLED LIGHT EXTRACTION FILM WITH MULTI-PERIODIC ZONES OF NANOSTRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Vivian W.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / LAMANSKY, Sergey
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / NELSON, James M.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / LE, Ha T.
3M Center
Post Office Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12828447.820.08.2012
WO2012US51548
Priority number, dateUS20111321861026.08.2011         Original published format: US201113218610
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013032759
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2748879
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/52
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
TitleGerman:OLED LICHTEXTRAKTIONSFOLIE MIT MEHRPERIODENZONEN VON NANOSTRUKTUREN[2014/27]
English:OLED LIGHT EXTRACTION FILM WITH MULTI-PERIODIC ZONES OF NANOSTRUCTURES[2014/27]
French:FILM D'EXTRACTION DE LUMIÈRE DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE ORGANIQUE (DELO) AYANT DES ZONES MULTI-PÉRIODIQUES DE NANOSTRUCTURES[2014/27]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2014National basic fee paid 
26.02.2014Search fee paid 
26.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
03.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.12.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009066241  (YOKOYAMA MITSURU [JP]) [X] 1,4-12,15 * page 12, paragraph 169 - page 14, paragraph 176; figures 1,2; example 1 *;
 [X]US2010150513  (ZHANG JUN-YING [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 54 - page 6, paragraph 56; figures 7, 13; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2010077070  (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2009015757  (POTTS JOHN E [US], et al);
 [A]WO2010077521  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]);
 [A]WO2010077070  (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR], et al);
 [A]EP1860471  (ROHM & HAAS [US])