Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750662

EP2750662 - APOPTOSIS-TARGETING NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Georgia Research Foundation, Inc.
Boyd Graduate Studies Research Center
Athens, GA 30602 / US
[2014/28]
Inventor(s)01 / DHAR, Shanta
1500 Timothy Road
Unit 29
Athens, Georgia 30606 / US
02 / MARRACHE, Sean
1829 NW Lovejoy St., Unit 403
Portlant, OR 97209 / US
 [2016/04]
Former [2014/28]01 / DHAR, Shanta
1500 Timothy Road
Unit 29
Athens, Georgia 30606 / US
02 / MARRACHE, Sean
120 Rachel Way
Athens, Georgia 30605 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12829002.031.08.2012
WO2012US53307
Priority number, dateUS201161529637P31.08.2011         Original published format: US 201161529637 P
[2014/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013033513
Date:07.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750662
Date:09.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2013
[2014/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/14, A61K49/18, A61K47/48, A61K38/08, A61K38/17, A61K45/06, A61K49/00, A61K31/315
[2015/26]
Former International [2014/28]A61K9/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/28]
TitleGerman:AUF APOPTOSE ABZIELENDE NANOPARTIKEL[2014/28]
English:APOPTOSIS-TARGETING NANOPARTICLES[2014/28]
French:NANOPARTICULES CIBLANT L'APOPTOSE[2014/28]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Search fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/28]
17.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2009110939  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [I] 1-22,25 * figure 1 * * page 2, paragraph 7 - page 6, paragraph 19 * * page 8, paragraph 27 * * page 32, paragraphs 117-118 * [Y] 23-25;
 [Y]WO2008124632  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 21 * * page 44, lines 8-11 * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO2006012201  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * claims 1, 4, 10, 18 *;
 [A]WO2010083337  (UNIV CALIFORINIA [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 3 - page 5, line 20 *
International search[Y]US2011027172  (WANG ZHUANG [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008206150  (LOUIE ANGELIQUE Y [US], et al);
 [A]US2011020242  (ZHENG GANG [CA], et al);
 [A]WO2011084620  (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL, et al);
 [A]US2009074828  (ALEXIS FRANK [US], et al)