blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2750662 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2750662



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 200
07.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 64
07.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.03.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 2
27.03.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
10.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
31.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
31.03.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Annex Search / examination 5
31.03.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
31.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.03.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
31.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
12.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
22.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
22.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.08.2015 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 17
17.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.08.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
16.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
29.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
29.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5