blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2750662
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9901616Global Dossier 27.02.2018B2
US2014303081 09.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201214240081 31.08.2012
US201161529637 31.08.2011
WO2012US53307 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6170047BGlobal Dossier 26.07.2017B2
JP2014526442 06.10.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161529637 31.08.2011
WO2012US53307 31.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2750662Global Dossier 24.06.2015A4
EP2750662 09.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161529637 31.08.2011
WO2012US53307 31.08.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013033513Global Dossier 07.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161529637 31.08.2011