Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797507

EP2797507 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING HAND AND/OR WRIST ROTATION OF A USER PERFORMING EXERCISE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / JIN, Sheng
c/o High Tech Campus 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / LIU, Yusi
c/o High Tech Campus 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date12829185.328.12.2012
WO2012IB57795
Priority number, dateWO2011CN8506030.12.2011         Original published format: PCT/CN2011/085060
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013098791
Date:04.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2797507
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.2013
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/11, A63B24/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERFOLGUNG EINER HAND- ODER HANDGELENKDREHUNG EINES ÜBUNGEN AUSFÜHRENDEN BENUTZERS[2014/45]
English:A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRACKING HAND AND/OR WRIST ROTATION OF A USER PERFORMING EXERCISE[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SUIVRE LA ROTATION D'UNE MAIN ET/OU D'UN POIGNET D'UN UTILISATEUR RÉALISANT UN EXERCICE[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
16.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007207873  (ROSE GREGORY A [US]) [Y] 1,5,10-12 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]EP1970104  (SSD CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0163] * * figures 1-3,19 *;
 [A]US2009231278  (ST HILAIRE PIERRE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 1,2 *
 [XY]  - DURGIN F H ET AL, "Palm boards are not action measures: An alternative to the two-systems theory of geographical slant perception", ACTA PSYCHOLOGICA, NORTH-HOLLAND, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 134, no. 2, ISSN 0001-6918, (20100601), pages 182 - 197, (20100221), XP026991665 [X] 6 * page 184, column r, paragraph 3 - page 185, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 190, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 1 * * figures 2,8,9 * [Y] 1,5,10-12
 [X]  - KOFMAN J ET AL, "Teleoperation of a Robot Manipulator Using a Vision-Based Human-Robot Interface", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20051001), vol. 52, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TIE.2005.855696, ISSN 0278-0046, pages 1206 - 1219, XP011139877 [X] 6 * page 1207, column r, paragraph l - page 1209, column l, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIE.2005.855696
 [A]  - CERVERI P ET AL, "Finger Kinematic Modeling and Real-Time Hand Motion Estimation", ANNALS OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20070815), vol. 35, no. 11, doi:10.1007/S10439-007-9364-0, ISSN 1573-9686, pages 1989 - 2002, XP019547583 [A] 1-12 * page 1990, column r, paragraph l - page 1997, column l, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10439-007-9364-0
by applicantWO2008099301