blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2755390 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2755390



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 409
12.04.2017 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 61
31.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 61
31.03.2017 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.11.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.11.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
13.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
13.11.2015 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of a new European search report (correction) Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 8
13.05.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
09.04.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
27.03.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 8
19.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
18.06.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.04.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.04.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
26.03.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
06.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
06.03.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 46
06.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
06.03.2014 Description Search / examination 46
06.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 9
06.03.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
06.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
17.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
14.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 41