blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2755390


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.04.2017 Withdrawal of application published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
30.03.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
20.11.2015 Amendment by applicant
12.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2015 Change - classification published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - classification published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
20.03.2015 Change - classification published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - classification published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
14.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
19.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
13.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
10.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
27.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication