blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2755390
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014192156Global Dossier 10.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011195073 07.09.2011
WO2012JP71437 24.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2755390Global Dossier 22.04.2015A4
EP2755390 16.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2011195073 07.09.2011
WO2012JP71437 24.08.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013035551Global Dossier 14.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2011195073 07.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5352869BGlobal Dossier 27.11.2013B2
JP2013058849 28.03.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2011195073 07.09.2011