blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2755390

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
Entry into regional phase06.03.2014Translation filed 
06.03.2014National basic fee paid 
06.03.2014Search fee paid 
06.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.07.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:16.07.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140306
 
Event date:17.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 13/00 20060101AFI20150313BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G09G 5/38 20060101ALI20150313BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G09G 5/00 20060101ALI20150313BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20150319
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G09G 5/36 20060101ALI20150313BHEP
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 13/04 20060101ALI20150313BHEP
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G09G 5/36 20060101ALI20150508BHEP
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 13/04 20060101ALI20150508BHEP
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G09G 5/00 20060101ALI20150508BHEP
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G09G 5/38 20060101ALI20150508BHEP
 
Event date:17.06.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04N 13/00 20060101AFI20150508BHEP
 
Event date:26.04.2017 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20170331
 
Event date:10.05.2017 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20170331