Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755390

EP2755390 - STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.05.2017  [2017/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
For all designated states
Kochi University Of Technology
185 Miyanokuchi
Tosayamada-cho
Kami-City, Kochi 782-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
For all designated states
Kochi University Of Technology
185 Miyanokuchi
Tosayamada-cho
Kami-City, Kochi 782-8502 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAI, Hisao
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / TSUBAKI, Ikuko
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / SETO, Mikio
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
04 / SHIGEMASU, Hiroaki
c/o Kochi University of Technology
185 Miyanokuchi
Tosayamada-cho
Kami-city, Kochi 782-8502 / JP
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12829273.724.08.2012
WO2012JP71437
Priority number, dateJP2011019507307.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011195073
[2014/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013035551
Date:14.03.2013
Language:JA
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755390
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, G09G5/00, G09G5/36, G09G5/38, H04N13/04
[2015/17]
Former International [2014/29]H04N13/04, G09G5/00, G09G5/36, G09G5/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
TitleGerman:STEREOSKOPISCHE BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEREOSKOPISCHES BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2014/29]
English:STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, STEREOSCOPIC IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2014/29]
French:APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE STÉRÉOSCOPIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE STÉRÉOSCOPIQUE ET PROGRAMME[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2014Translation filed 
06.03.2014National basic fee paid 
06.03.2014Search fee paid 
06.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
13.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/19]
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010328427  (SAKANO MORIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0053] *;
 [Y]EP1883250  (ERA KAZUNARI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]WO2011024710  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 7-13 * figure 10 *;
 [A]WO2011052389  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2011166498  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]WO2011052389  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2011055022
 JP3157384B
    - MITSUHIRO YOSHIDA; HIROAKI SHIGEMASU, "Spatial and Temporal Range of Binocular Local Contrast Effect", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, HIP2010-60, (201011), pages 1 - 6