Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2754290

EP2754290 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONSUMER CONTROL OVER INTERACTIVE TELEVISION EXPOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
13.05.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
1-14-1, Tamagawa
Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 158-0094 / JP
[2015/44]
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
Rakuten, Inc.
4-12-3, Higashishinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOLAND, Madeleine
36 Birch Street
Quincy, MA 02171 / US
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12829441.010.09.2012
WO2012US54486
Priority number, dateUS201161532901P09.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161532901 P
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013036944
Date:14.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2754290
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16, H04N21/258, H04N21/2668, H04N21/441, H04N21/45, H04N21/454, H04N21/475, H04N21/478, H04N21/81
[2015/18]
Former International [2014/29]H04N7/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BENUTZERKONTROLLE ÜBER EINE INTERAKTIVE FERNSEHBELICHTUNG[2014/29]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONSUMER CONTROL OVER INTERACTIVE TELEVISION EXPOSURE[2014/29]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE CONTRÔLE D'UN CLIENT SUR UNE EXPOSITION À UNE TÉLÉVISION INTERACTIVE[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2014National basic fee paid 
06.03.2014Search fee paid 
06.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
13.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2019Fee for grant paid
09.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008216108  (BEAUNOIR NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-10,12,13 * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1-9 * [I] 11;
 [X]EP1088446  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0102] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2007022434  (OH KEUM-YONG [KR]) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0067] * * figures 4-6 *
International search[X]US2005147247  (WESTBERG THOMAS E [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010293160  (ARAVAMUDAN MURALI [US], et al);
 [A]US6148081  (SZYMANSKI STEVEN [US], et al);
 [A]US2007157234  (WALKER TODD A [US]);
 [A]US2004117831  (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al)