Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2753879

EP2753879 - BURNER COMPRISING A REACTOR FOR CATALYTIC BURNING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reformtech Heating Holding AB
Skalholtsgatan 2
164 40 Kista / SE
[2014/29]
Inventor(s)01 / LINDSTRÖM, Bård
Hässleholmsvägen 9
S-121 53 Johanneshov / SE
02 / HAGSTRÖM, Daniel
Gärdsvägen 5
S-182 75 Stocksund / SE
03 / BENEYTO SATORRES, Paula
Kungshamra 2 lgh 1305
S-170 70 Solna / SE
04 / LÖGDBERG, Sara Marie
Åsavägen 8
S-132 44 Saltsjö-boo / SE
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Brann AB
P.O. Box 12246
102 26 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12830157.910.09.2012
WO2012SE50950
Priority number, dateSE2011005080808.09.2011         Original published format: SE 1150808
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013036198
Date:14.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2753879
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F23C13/06
[2015/18]
Former International [2014/29]F23C13/00, F23R3/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
TitleGerman:BRENNER MIT EINEM REAKTOR FÜR KATALYTISCHE VERBRENNUNG[2014/29]
English:BURNER COMPRISING A REACTOR FOR CATALYTIC BURNING[2014/29]
French:BRÛLEUR COMPRENANT UN RÉACTEUR POUR COMBUSTION CATALYTIQUE[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2014National basic fee paid 
19.02.2014Search fee paid 
19.02.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
20.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.02.2019Request for further processing filed
06.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.02.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201807   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[IA]US2005044842  (DINU CONSTANTIN ALEXANDRU [US]) [I] 1-4,6,9 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * [A] 5;
 [I]US5461864  (BETTA RALPH D [US], et al) [I] 1-3,9 * column 1, line 6 - line 26; figures 1,7 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, line 18 - line 27 * * column 6, line 29 - line 65 *;
 [A]GB588086  (POWER JETS LTD, et al) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 8 - line 14; figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 12 - line 33 * * page 3, line 111 - line 128 * * page 4, line 4 - line 18 *;
 [A]EP2023040  (NIPPON CHEM PLANT CONSULTANT [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] *
International search[A]US5987878  (KOYAMA KAZUHITO [JP], et al);
 [A]EP1843098  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]US2003188486  (TANAKA SHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]GB739699  (BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM);
 [A]JPS59225211  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)