blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2754213


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.05.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2017 Change - representative
27.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.02.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.02.2017 First examination report
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.05.2015 Change - classification published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
01.05.2015 Change - classification published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
01.05.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
14.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
04.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
03.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
13.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
11.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication