blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2754213
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6072800BGlobal Dossier 01.02.2017B2
JP2014530451 17.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113227586 08.09.2011
WO2012US53998 06.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2754213Global Dossier 03.06.2015A4
EP2754213 16.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113227586 08.09.2011
WO2012US53998 06.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013036666Global Dossier 14.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113227586 08.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9335637Global Dossier 10.05.2016B2
US2013063803 14.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113227586 08.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6309078BGlobal Dossier 11.04.2018B2
JP2017097369 01.06.2017A
Priority number Date
US201113227586 08.09.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI590713B 01.07.2017B
TW201320830 16.05.2013A
Priority number Date
US201113227586 08.09.2011