Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2754213

EP2754213 - LASER-PRODUCED PLASMA EUV SOURCE WITH REDUCED DEBRIS GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kla-Tencor Corporation
One Technology Drive
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
[2014/29]
Inventor(s)01 / DELGADO, Gildardo
5945 Linwood Common
Livermore, California 94550 / US
02 / WACK, Daniel
16027 Tidewater Trail
Fredericksburg, Virginia 22408 / US
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Keane, Paul Fachtna
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date12830191.806.09.2012
WO2012US53998
Priority number, dateUS20111322758608.09.2011         Original published format: US201113227586
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013036666
Date:14.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2754213
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU14.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05G2/00, G03F7/20
[2015/23]
Former International [2014/29]H01S3/0977, H01J63/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
TitleGerman:LASERERZEUGTE EUV-PLASMAQUELLE MIT REDUZIERTER RÜCKSTANDERZEUGUNG[2014/29]
English:LASER-PRODUCED PLASMA EUV SOURCE WITH REDUCED DEBRIS GENERATION[2014/29]
French:SOURCE EUV PLASMA PRODUIT PAR LASER À GÉNÉRATION DE DÉBRIS RÉDUITE[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2014National basic fee paid 
08.04.2014Search fee paid 
08.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
30.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011102277  (GIGAPHOTON INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,11,12,14 * abstract * [I] 2,4,8,9,13,15;
 EP2538759  [ ] (GIGAPHOTON INC [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0058] - [0061] - [0062] , [0063] , [0070] - [0072] - [0077] - [0088] - [0098] - [0104]; figures 10,11,14,15,17 *;
 [XI]US2010090133  (ENDO AKIRA [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044] - [0065] - [0071] - [0074] , [0077] - [0078] - [0088] - [0098]; figures 4,10-17 * [I] 4,6-15;
 [XI]US2007158577  (TOMIE TOSHIHISA [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] , [0042] , [0052] - [0058] - [0060] , [0067] , [0075]; figures 5,6 * [I] 2-4,8,9,12,13;
 [A]US2006215712  (ZIENER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 8,9 * paragraph [0053]; figures 13,5 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0030] - [0054] - [0071] - [0075] - [0077] - [0080] - [0084]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US2010213395  (UENO YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0048] , [0049] , [0050] , [0055]; figures 1,4-6,11 *
International search[X]US2007158577  (TOMIE TOSHIHISA [JP]);
 [Y]US2006215712  (ZIENER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al);
 [Y]US2010078577  (MORIYA MASATO [JP], et al);
 [Y]RU2301485  (KOMMISSARIAT A L EHNERZHI ATOM [FR])
by applicantWO2011102277
 US2010090133
 US2007158577