Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2753278

EP2753278 - DISPOSABLE WEARING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2017/43]
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ARAYAMA, Takaya
c/o Technical Center of UNICHARM CORPORATION
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / MUKAI, Hirotomo
c/o Technical Center of UNICHARM CORPORATION
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/43]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Former [2014/29]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12830205.605.09.2012
[2017/43]
WO2012JP05617
Priority number, dateJP2011019520707.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011195207
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013035318
Date:14.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2753278
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2013
[2014/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2753278
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/49, A61F13/532, A61F13/535, A61F13/494
[2017/25]
Former International [2014/29]A61F13/15, A61F13/49, A61F13/494, A61F13/53
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINWEG-GEBRAUCHSARTIKEL[2014/29]
English:DISPOSABLE WEARING ARTICLE[2014/29]
French:ARTICLE VESTIMENTAIRE JETABLE[2014/29]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2014National basic fee paid 
06.03.2014Search fee paid 
06.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
05.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2017Fee for grant paid
29.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.06.2017
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO03026545  (KAO CORP [JP]; KOYAMA TAKAO [JP]; ITO HIDEKAZU [JP]; INADA HIROSHI [JP) [X] 1-4,9 * figures 1, 2 * * page 12, line 23 - line 30 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 14 * * page 25, line 12 - line 24; figure 14 * [I] 8,11;
 [XI]EP2184043  (LIVEDO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,8-10,12 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 30] , [0 51] , [0 52] * [I] 7;
 [X]EP1723939  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 2-10 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1, 2, 5, 8 *;
 [XP]WO2012067217  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]; NAKAJIMA KAIYO [JP]; TODA HARUKI [JP]) [XP] 1-6,8,9,11 * figures 1, 2, 6 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] *;
 [E]EP2640330  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-6,8,9,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2005006954  (LIVEDO CORP) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2003093441  (KAO CORPORATION);
 [Y]JP2006346439  (UNICHARM CORPORATION);
 [Y]JP2005312557  (KAO CORPORATION);
 [Y]JP2005137648  (UNICHARM CORPORATION);
 [Y]JP2010075462  (KAO CORPORATION)