Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2756623

EP2756623 - ENHANCED LOCAL ACCESS IN MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS WITH FDD RESOURCE ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[2018/14]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
Sanno Park Tower
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Hiroyuki
3240 Hillview Avenue
Palo Alto, California 94304-1201 / US
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2018/14]
Former [2014/30]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12831801.112.09.2012
[2018/14]
WO2012US54856
Priority number, dateUS201161533382P12.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161533382 P
US201161534709P14.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161534709 P
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013040028
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2756623
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2756623
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.05.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/08, // H04W84/04
[2017/47]
Former International [2015/29]H04W76/02
Former International [2014/30]H04L1/04, H04L5/00, H04W72/00, H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERWEITERTER LOKALER ZUGRIFF IN DER MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATION MIT FDD-RESSOURCENZUWEISUNG[2014/30]
English:ENHANCED LOCAL ACCESS IN MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS WITH FDD RESOURCE ALLOCATION[2014/30]
French:ACCÈS LOCAL AMÉLIORÉ DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS MOBILES AVEC ALLOCATION DE RESSOURCES FDD[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2014National basic fee paid 
11.04.2014Search fee paid 
11.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
31.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.02.2018Fee for grant paid
02.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.02.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
22.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2017
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
MC04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/11]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010056160  (KIM YUNG-SOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,10-14,19-23 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1A-3C * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0205]; figure 12 * * paragraph [0337] - paragraph [0375]; figures 20-22 * [I] 6-9,15-18;
 [T]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Local IP Access and Selected IP Traffic Offload (LIPA-SIPTO) (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.829, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110329), no. V10.0.0, pages 1 - 43, XP050476492 [T] 1-23 * page 7 - page 9 *
International search[X]US2011003597  (BUDIC MIROSLAV [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011044244  (ETEMAD KAMRAN [US]);
 [Y]WO2010027308  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al);
 [Y]WO2011041623  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al)