blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2756623 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2756623



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 866
08.02.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.02.2018 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
22.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.02.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
22.02.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 104
22.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 104
05.02.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
02.02.2018 Annex Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 8
02.02.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
02.02.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
02.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.11.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 104
09.11.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 104
01.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
01.09.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 8
01.09.2017 Description Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
02.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
31.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
31.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
31.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
31.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 12
03.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
17.06.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
08.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.05.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.04.2014 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
14.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
11.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 94
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 81
21.03.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 105