blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2756623


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019 [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
02.03.2018 (Expected) grant published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
23.02.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.02.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.02.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.02.2018 Change - classification published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
05.02.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.10.2017 Change - classification published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
29.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.04.2017 First examination report
30.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.06.2015 Supplementary search report published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
20.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
03.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication