blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2756623 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280038270 CN201280038695 CN201810153756 CN201810558158 EP12792917 EP12794051 EP12831801 EP12831966 EP18204318



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013040070Global Dossier 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261616309 27.03.2012
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201261607901 07.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012166975Global Dossier 06.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012166969Global Dossier 06.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017272364Global Dossier 21.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US40288 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201715470262 27.03.2017
US201414118826 28.02.2014
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014198655Global Dossier 17.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201214118826 31.05.2012
WO2012US40288 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014153390Global Dossier 05.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201214118473 31.05.2012
WO2012US40279 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9949184Global Dossier 17.04.2018B2
US2017118684 27.04.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201414344570 12.03.2014
US201715400658 06.01.2017
US201261616309 27.03.2012
US201514872924 01.10.2015
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201261607901 07.03.2012
WO2012US54912 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9942818Global Dossier 10.04.2018B2
US2017127328 04.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201414344570 12.03.2014
US201261616309 27.03.2012
US201514872924 01.10.2015
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201715400594 06.01.2017
US201261607901 07.03.2012
WO2012US54912 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9578564Global Dossier 21.02.2017B2
US2016057670 25.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414344570 12.03.2014
US201261616309 27.03.2012
US201514872924 01.10.2015
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201261607901 07.03.2012
WO2012US54912 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9544827Global Dossier 10.01.2017B2
US2014342738 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201214344492 12.09.2012
US201161534709 14.09.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
WO2012US54856 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9226206Global Dossier 29.12.2015B2
US2014349659 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261616309 27.03.2012
US201214344570 12.09.2012
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201261607901 07.03.2012
WO2012US54912 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140044355Global Dossier 14.04.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US40288 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101901267BGlobal Dossier 21.09.2018B1
KR20140034274 19.03.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US40279 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014522602Global Dossier 04.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US40288 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014522601Global Dossier 04.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US40279 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6400752BGlobal Dossier 03.10.2018B2
JP2017099019 01.06.2017A
Priority number Date
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6306671BGlobal Dossier 04.04.2018B2
JP2017034728 09.02.2017A
Priority number Date
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6130836BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2017B2
JP2014530538 17.11.2014A
Priority number Date
US201161534709 14.09.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
WO2012US54856 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3457751Global Dossier 20.03.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US40279 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
EP12794051 31.05.2012
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2756726Global Dossier 11.11.2015A4
EP2756726 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261616309 27.03.2012
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201261607901 07.03.2012
WO2012US54912 12.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2716102Global Dossier 27.05.2015A4
EP2716102 09.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US40288 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2715981Global Dossier 28.11.2018B1
EP2715981 20.05.2015A4
EP2715981 09.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US40279 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108684060Global Dossier 19.10.2018A
Priority number Date
CN201280038695 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108419273Global Dossier 17.08.2018A
Priority number Date
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
CN201280038270 31.05.2012
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103733682Global Dossier 16.04.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US40288 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103718514BGlobal Dossier 16.03.2018B
CN103718514 09.04.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US40279 31.05.2012
US201161492321 01.06.2011
US201161502023 28.06.2011
US201161512132 27.07.2011
US201161500426 23.06.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
US201161505955 08.07.2011
US201161503975 01.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2756623Global Dossier 04.04.2018B1
EP2756623 15.07.2015A4
EP2756623 23.07.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201161534709 14.09.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011
WO2012US54856 12.09.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013040028Global Dossier 15.05.2014A3
WO2013040028 21.03.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161534709 14.09.2011
US201161533382 12.09.2011