blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2756726 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2756726



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 947
04.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.04.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
04.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 158
04.04.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 158
14.03.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.03.2019 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
05.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 7
05.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.03.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
09.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
21.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 7
21.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.10.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.09.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
09.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
09.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 13
09.05.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
19.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
29.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 17
12.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 6
17.08.2015 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
17.08.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
15.06.2015 Partial European search report Search / examination 7
02.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
24.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 12
24.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 109
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 81
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 106
21.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 164