Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2756831

EP2756831 - OSCILLATING/FEEDING APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019 [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / KOKUBO, Makoto
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
2606 Akabane
Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
02 / SERA Takeshi
c/o Kao Corporation
Research Laboratories
2606 Akabane
Ichikai-machi
Haga-gun Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2014/30]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12832071.007.09.2012
[2019/32]
WO2012JP72928
Priority number, dateJP2011019878612.09.2011         Original published format: JP 2011198786
[2014/30]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013039004
Date:21.03.2013
Language:JA
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2756831
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2756831
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/49, B32B37/12, B32B37/20, B32B38/00, B32B38/18
[2018/42]
Former International [2014/30]A61F13/15, A61F13/49
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHWINGUNGS-/ZUFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KONTINUIERLICHES ELEMENT[2014/30]
English:OSCILLATING/FEEDING APPARATUS FOR CONTINUOUS MEMBER[2014/30]
French:APPAREIL D'OSCILLATION/ALIMENTATION POUR UN ÉLÉMENT CONTINU[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2014Translation filed 
28.03.2014National basic fee paid 
28.03.2014Search fee paid 
28.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
24.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2019Fee for grant paid
27.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003120245  (FRANKLIN KENT A [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14 * figures 2, 2A, 3, 6-9, 11, 13; paragraphs 5, 8, 10, 48, 56, 73-80, 81, 86, 88-91 *;
 [X]US2003010423  (NAKAKADO MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,14 * figures 1-5, 7, 8, 10; paragraphs 43, 77-80, 97-99, 103, 107 *;
 [X]US5389173  (MERKATORIS JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9-11,14 * the whole document *;
 [XI]US5525175  (BLENKE TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * the whole document * [I] 14;
 [XI]US6217690  (RAJALA GREGORY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * the whole document * [I] 14;
 [E]EP2679206  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,9-12 * figures 1-6; paragraphs 1, 4, 9, 61-64, 73; claims 1-5 *;
 [E]EP2679205  (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,9-12 * figures 1-6; paragraphs 61-65, 74, 75; claims 1-5 *
International search[A]JPH04325154  (UNI CHARM CORP);
 [A]JP2001178769  (ZUIKO CORP);
 [A]JPH0970412  (KYOTO SEISAKUSHO)
by applicantJPH0970412
 JP2010088750