blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2756831


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.05.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.09.2018 Change - classification published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
14.09.2018 Change - classification published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
26.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
28.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 Change - classification published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - classification published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
14.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
27.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
10.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
22.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication