blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2756831

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure10.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Entry into regional phase10.03.2014Translation filed 
28.03.2014National basic fee paid 
28.03.2014Search fee paid 
28.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:23.07.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140328
 
Event date:23.07.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:17.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20150429
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61F 13/15 20060101AFI20150422BHEP
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61F 13/49 20060101ALI20150422BHEP
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B32B 38/18 20060101ALI20180913BHEP
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B32B 37/12 20060101ALI20180913BHEP
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61F 13/49 20060101ALI20180913BHEP
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B32B 37/20 20060101ALI20180913BHEP
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B32B 38/00 20060101ALI20180913BHEP
 
Event date:17.10.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61F 13/15 20060101AFI20180913BHEP
 
Event date:05.06.2019 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20190510