blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2755493 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2755493



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 194
20.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.12.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.12.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
14.12.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
20.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.11.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
20.11.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 Description Search / examination 3
20.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.11.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.04.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.04.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
18.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
21.10.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
12.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
30.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
30.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
17.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
28.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
24.01.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.12.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
09.04.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
21.03.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.03.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21