blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2758044

EP2758044 - COMPOSITIONS FOR SKIN EXFOLIATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2019  [2019/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]For all designated states
Allergan, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive, T2-7H
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COLVAN, Lora
1354 Nightshade Road
Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US
02 / MEHTA, Rahul
695 Shenandoah Avenue
San Marcos, CA 92078 / US
03 / SONTI, Sujatha
1273 Avenida Fragata
San Marcos, CA 92069 / US
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12833417.421.09.2012
WO2012US56681
Priority number, dateUS20111324356723.09.2011         Original published format: US201113243567
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013044111
Date:28.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2758044
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2015
ClassificationIPC:A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08, A61Q19/10, A61K8/365, A61K8/67, A61K31/07
[2015/25]
CPC:
A61K8/365 (EP,US); A61K8/368 (EP,US); A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP); A61P17/02 (EP); A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US); A61Q19/10 (EP,US); A61K2800/28 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2014/31]A61K31/07
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HAUTEXFOLIATION UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2014/31]
English:COMPOSITIONS FOR SKIN EXFOLIATION AND USE THEREOF[2014/31]
French:COMPOSITIONS POUR L'EXFOLIATION DE LA PEAU ET LEUR UTILISATION[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase17.04.2014National basic fee paid 
17.04.2014Search fee paid 
17.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
14.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/03]
11.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/03]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003165546  (RESCH BRADLEY STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples 1a-1d, 3a-3d, 4a-4d, 5a-5d *;
 [X]US6358517  (PILLAI SREEKUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples 4,7,9 *;
 [XY]US2010255079  (SANMIGUEL GABRIEL SERRANO [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * tables 2,6 * [Y] 6-15;
 [XA]US2006263398  (KALIL ABDALA [US]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-20 * [A] 6-15;
 [X]US5997889  (DURR NORMA JEAN HOLLOWAY [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples 1,2 * * claim 1 *;
 [XY]US2006051429  (MURAD HOWARD [US]) [X] 1-5 * examples 2,3 * * paragraph [0040] * [Y] 6-15;
 [X]US2003232091  (SHEFER ADI [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples 1,7 *;
 [X]KR20050028544  (KOLMAR CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [Y]CA2164229  (DERMATOLOGY HOME PROD INC [US], et al) [Y] 6-15 * page 25, line 32 - page 28, line 10 *;
 [A]US4608370  (ARONSOHN RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007025949  (HANSENNE ISABELLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - Basf Ag, "Retinol", (20050501), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.dr-baumann-international.co.uk/science/BASF%20Vitamin%20A.pdf, (20150429), XP055186755 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-15
International search[Y]US6358517  (PILLAI SREEKUMAR [US], et al);
 [Y]US6782307  (WILMOTT JAMES M [US], et al);
 [Y]CA2164229  (DERMATOLOGY HOME PROD INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010255079  (SANMIGUEL GABRIEL SERRANO [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003165546  (RESCH BRADLEY STEVEN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004034098  (VARANI JAMES [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.